US HB8923 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to ensure a health care practitioner exercises the proper degree of care in the case of a child who survives an abortion or attempted abortion.
Title
Protection of Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-12-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB962 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB130 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB311 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 58. (CR S1136)
SB130 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB311 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 58. (CR S1136)
Subjects
Abortion
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Health care quality
Health personnel
Legal fees and court costs
Medical ethics
Violent crime
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Health care quality
Health personnel
Legal fees and court costs
Medical ethics
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8923/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8923/BILLS-116hr8923ih.pdf |