US HB894 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to convey to a specified claimant or claimants the approximately 229.72 acres of the land that was in place during the original survey of the land surrounding Lake Bistineau (including Peggy's Island and Hog Island) that was conducted in 1838.
Title
Lake Bistineau Land Title Stability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/894/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr894/BILLS-116hr894ih.pdf |