US HB91 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) to assess sanitation and safety conditions on land set aside to provide Columbia River Treaty tribes access to traditional fishing grounds. The bill applies to land held by the United States for the benefit of the Nez Perce Tribe, the Confederated Tribes of Umatilla Indian Reservation, the Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. The BIA may enter into contracts with tribes or tribal organizations to improve sanitation, safety conditions, and access to electricity, sewer, and water infrastructure on this land. The Government Accountability Office must report whether the sanitation and safety conditions on the lands have improved as a result of the contracts.
Title
Columbia River In-Lieu and Treaty Fishing Access Sites Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 168 (Y: 396 N: 18 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2019-04-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 18 (Roll no. 168). (text: CR H3290) |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3294) |
2019-04-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-04-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 91. |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3290-3291) |
2019-04-29 | House | Mr. Van Drew moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB50 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-99. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
Oregon
Solid waste and recycling
Washington State
Water quality
Water use and supply
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
Oregon
Solid waste and recycling
Washington State
Water quality
Water use and supply