US HB95 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 199-99-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Homeless Veteran Families Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeless Veteran Families Act

Sponsors

Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback