US HB951 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to develop and report to Congress a strategy to improve bilateral tourism between the United States and Mexico and third-party tourism to the two countries. The strategy shall involve dialogue and cooperation between the two governments. It shall prioritize sectors including hospitality, retail, and cultural education.
Title
United States-Mexico Tourism Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-06-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4381-4382) |
2019-06-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 951. |
2019-06-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4381-4383) |
2019-06-10 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere, Civilian Security and Trade. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Dental care
Health facilities and institutions
International affairs
Mexico
Multilateral development programs
Public-private cooperation
Travel and tourism
Dental care
Health facilities and institutions
International affairs
Mexico
Multilateral development programs
Public-private cooperation
Travel and tourism