US HB965 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-13)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Supplemental report filed by the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 116-55, Part III.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CREATES Act of 2019 Creating and Restoring Equal Access to Equivalent Samples Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CREATES Act of 2019 Creating and Restoring Equal Access to Equivalent Samples Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSupplemental report filed by the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 116-55, Part III.
2019-05-16HousePERMISSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL - Ms. Lofgren asked unanimous consent that Committee on the Judiciary be authorized to file a supplemental report on the bill, H.R. 965. Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 33.
2019-05-10HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-55, Part II.
2019-05-10HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-55, Part I.
2019-04-30HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-04-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-03HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB340 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2700 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB1895 (Related) 2019-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback