US HB967 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes rural water supply projects in Montana and North Dakota. Specifically, the bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to (1) plan and construct the Musselshell-Judith Rural Water System for certain communities in Montana, and (2) study the feasibility of constructing the Dry-Redwater Regional Water System for certain communities in Montana and North Dakota.
Title
Clean Water for Rural Communities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB334 (Same As) 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 253.
Subjects
Electric power generation and transmission
Montana
North Dakota
Rural conditions and development
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Montana
North Dakota
Rural conditions and development
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/967/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr967/BILLS-116hr967ih.pdf |