US HB970 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Park Service to remove and appropriately dispose of the monument to General Robert E. Lee at the Antietam National Battlefield in Maryland.
Title
Robert E. Lee Statue Removal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7118) |
2020-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 970. |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7118-7119) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-12-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 500. |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-608. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-07-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Maryland
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Congressional oversight
Maryland
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history