US HB98 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes aliens associated with criminal gangs inadmissible for entry into the United States and deportable, and establishes procedures related to designating groups with criminal gang status. An alien shall be inadmissible if a consular officer, the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), or the Department of Justice knows or has reason to believe that the individual is or was a criminal gang member, or has participated or aided such a group's illegal activities. An alien who is or was a member of such a gang, or has participated or aided such a group's illegal activities, shall be deportable. Such individuals shall be subject to mandatory detention, shall not be eligible for asylum, temporary protected status, or special immigrant juvenile visas and shall not be eligible for parole unless they are assisting the government in a law enforcement matter. The bill defines a criminal gang as a group of five or more persons (1) where one of its primary purposes is the commission of specified criminal offenses and the members of which engage or have engaged within the past five years in a continuing series of such offenses, or (2) that has been designated as a criminal gang by DHS. The bill establishes procedures for DHS to designate a group such status, including notification to Congress, publication in the Federal Register, and an opportunity for the group to petition for administrative and judicial review.
Title
Criminal Alien Gang Member Removal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB574 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1106 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB599 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1106 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB599 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Organized crime
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Organized crime
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Violent crime
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/98/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr98/BILLS-116hr98ih.pdf |