US HB984 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates specified segments of the Nashua, Squannacook, and Nissitissit rivers in Massachusetts and New Hampshire as components of the Wild and Scenic Rivers System. The bill excludes from such designation certain areas with respect to the Ice House and Pepperell hydroelectric projects and the Hollingsworth and Vose dam.
Title
Nashua River Wild and Scenic River Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
SB339 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB339 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Massachusetts
New Hampshire
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Dams and canals
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Massachusetts
New Hampshire
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/984/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr984/BILLS-116hr984ih.pdf |