US HCR10 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution authorizes the use of the rotunda of the Capitol to honor, upon death, the last surviving Medal of Honor recipient for acts performed during World War II, at the election of the individual or their next of kin.
Title
Authorizing the use of the rotunda of the Capitol to honor the last surviving Medal of Honor recipient of the Second World War upon death.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. John Rose [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Congress
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
U.S. Capitol
Conflicts and wars
Congress
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
U.S. Capitol
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/10/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hconres10/BILLS-116hconres10ih.pdf |