US HCR105 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution authorizes the use of the Capitol rotunda on July 27-July 29, 2020, for the lying in state of the remains of the Honorable John Lewis, late a Representative of Georgia.
Title
Permitting the remains of the Honorable John Lewis, late a Representative from the State of Georgia, to lie in state in the rotunda of the Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4513) |
2020-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-24 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3849) |
2020-07-24 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3848-3849) |
2020-07-24 | House | Ms. Fudge asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced. |
2020-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Congress
Congressional tributes
Georgia
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
U.S. Capitol
Congress
Congressional tributes
Georgia
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
U.S. Capitol