US HCR57 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event on September 10, 2019, to commemorate the 400th anniversary of the arrival of the first African slaves to the territory that would become the United States.
Title
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall for an event to commemorate the 400th anniversary of the arrival of the first African slaves to the territory that would become the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5364) |
2019-08-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-08-16 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7503) |
2019-08-16 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7503) |
2019-08-16 | House | Without objection, the Chair laid before the House H. Con. Res. 57. |
2019-08-16 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2019-08-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-08-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR53 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.