US HCR60 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-48)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses support for the observance of Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month to provide a special opportunity to offer education on the importance of early detection and screening. Recognizes the national and community organizations for their work in promoting awareness of colorectal cancer, providing information on the importance of prevention and early detection through regular screening, and facilitating access to treatment. Urges organizations and health practitioners to promote awareness and to support early identification and removal of pre-cancerous polyps through colorectal cancer screenings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the observance of Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month, and for other purposes.

Sponsors

Rep. Todd Akin [R-MO]Rep. Jason Altmire [D-PA]Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN]Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL]
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD]Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX]Rep. Marion Berry [D-AR]
Rep. Brian Bilbray [R-CA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]
Rep. Jo Bonner [R-AL]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU]Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK]Rep. Rick Boucher [D-VA]
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL]Rep. Henry Brown [R-SC]Rep. Ginny Brown-Waite [R-FL]
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN]Rep. Steve Buyer [R-IN]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]
Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT]
Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL]Rep. John Culberson [R-TX]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Geoff Davis [R-KY]
Rep. Lincoln Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI]Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA]Rep. Elton Gallegly [R-CA]
Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Bart Gordon [D-TN]
Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Gene Green [D-TX]Rep. Parker Griffith [R-AL]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX]Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS]Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV]
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Rep. Paul Hodes [D-NH]Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS]
Rep. Patrick Kennedy [D-RI]Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Christopher Lee [R-NY]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]
Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]
Rep. Eric Massa [D-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI]Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. John McHugh [R-NY]Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Charlie Melancon [D-LA]Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME]Rep. Brad Miller [D-NC]Rep. James Moran [D-VA]
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA]Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC]Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA]Rep. James Oberstar [D-MN]Rep. John Olver [D-MA]
Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN]Rep. Adam Putnam [R-FL]Rep. George Radanovich [R-CA]Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV]
Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL]
Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL]Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA]Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX]Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI]
Rep. John Sullivan [R-OK]Rep. Gene Taylor [D-MS]Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA]
Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-31 Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2009-03-30 Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2009-03-30 On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4088-4089)
2009-03-30 DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 60.
2009-03-30 Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4088-4090)
2009-03-30 Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
2009-02-26 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2009-02-25 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HR1114 (Same As) 2010-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback