US HCR60 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution (1) calls upon the Members of Congress and all people of the United States to observe September 11, 2019, as a National Day of Service and Remembrance in honor of those who lost their lives or were injured in the September 11, 2001, attacks, and in tribute to those who came to the aid of those in need and to the defense of the United States; and (2) recognizes the heroic actions of first responders and other citizens in New York, the District of Columbia, and Shanksville, Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing September 11, 2019, as a "National Day of Service and Remembrance".
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR25 (Same As) 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HCR115 (Related) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SCR44 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5615-5616)
HCR115 (Related) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SCR44 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5615-5616)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime victims
District of Columbia
First responders and emergency personnel
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Military personnel and dependents
National and community service
National symbols
New York City
Pennsylvania
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism
Virginia
Crime victims
District of Columbia
First responders and emergency personnel
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Military personnel and dependents
National and community service
National symbols
New York City
Pennsylvania
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/60/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hconres60/BILLS-116hconres60ih.pdf |