US HCR87 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on April 21, 2020, for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.
Title
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1745-1746) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-04 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1485) |
2020-03-04 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1485) |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ms. Lofgren asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR31 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congress
Crime victims
Europe
Germany
Religion
U.S. Capitol
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Congress
Crime victims
Europe
Germany
Religion
U.S. Capitol
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity