US HCR90 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution permits the Grand Lodge of the Fraternal Order of Police and its auxiliary to sponsor as free public events on the Capitol grounds the 39th Annual National Peace Officers Memorial Service, on May 15, 2020, to honor the law enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2019; and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition, on May 14, 2020, to allow law enforcement representatives to exhibit their ability to demonstrate Honor Guard programs and provide for a bagpipe exhibition.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 91. |
2020-09-04 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-483. |
2020-02-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR16 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol