US HCR92 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution requires the printing of a revised and updated version of House Document 108-223, titled Women in Congress, 1917-2006.
Title
Authorizing the printing of a revised and updated version of the House document entitled "Women in Congress, 1917-2006".
Sponsors
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5616; text: CR 07/30/2020 S4178) |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-07-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-30 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4178) |
2020-07-30 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2020-07-30 | House | Mrs. Davis (CA) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Books and print media
Congress
Government information and archives
House Committee on House Administration
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
U.S. history
Congress
Government information and archives
House Committee on House Administration
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
U.S. history