US HJR1 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution provides continuing FY2019 appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) through the earlier of February 8, 2019, or the enactment of the applicable appropriations legislation. It is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and ends the partial DHS shutdown that began on December 22, 2018, because the existing CR expired and the FY2019 DHS appropriations bill has not been enacted. The CR also compensates DHS employees furloughed as a result of any lapse in appropriations that began on or about December 22, 2018, and ended upon the enactment of this joint resolution; reimburses or compensates certain states, federal grantees, and furloughed state employees for the lapse in DHS appropriations; and ratifies and approves certain obligations incurred in anticipation of the appropriations made and the authority granted by this joint resolution. Additionally, the CR has the effect of extending through February 8, 2019, several immigration programs and authorities that were extended in prior CRs and expired on December 21, 2018.
Title
Making further continuing appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-03 - House - On passage RC# 9 (Y: 239 N: 192 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-03 - House - On motion to recommit RC# 8 (Y: 197 N: 233 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-03 - House - On motion to recommit RC# 8 (Y: 197 N: 233 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the consideration of measure presented in Senate. (CR S1155) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1152) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 6. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-01-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-03 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 239 - 192 (Roll no. 9). (text: CR H190) |
2019-01-03 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 197 - 233 (Roll No. 8). |
2019-01-03 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered without objection. |
2019-01-03 | House | Floor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Granger motion to recommit. |
2019-01-03 | House | Ms. Granger moved to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-01-03 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-01-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with thirty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 1. |
2019-01-03 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 5. (consideration: CR H190-196) |
2019-01-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations discharged. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Homeland Security
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration status and procedures
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Department of Homeland Security
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration status and procedures
State and local finance
State and local government operations