US HJR10 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of September 2021 as "Gospel Music Heritage Month" and honoring gospel music for its valuable and longstanding contributions to the culture of the United States.
Title
Expressing support for designation of September 2021 as "Gospel Music Heritage Month" and honoring gospel music for its valuable and longstanding contributions to the culture of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR56 (Same As) 2021-08-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1042 (Related) 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1402 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1042 (Related) 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1402 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-joint-resolution/10/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hjres10/BILLS-117hjres10ih.pdf |