US HJR25 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment limiting Members of the Senate to two terms and Members of the House of Representatives to six terms. Terms beginning before the ratification of this article shall not count towards term limits.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to limit the number of terms a Representative or Senator may serve.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR29 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR2 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR4 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR9 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR23 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR2 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR4 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR9 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR23 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-joint-resolution/25/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hjres25/BILLS-116hjres25ih.pdf |