US HJR27 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-15 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 237 - 187 (Roll no. 31).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-15 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 237 - 187 (Roll no. 31).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution provides continuing FY2019 appropriations to several federal agencies through the earlier of February 1, 2019, or the enactment of the applicable appropriations legislation. It is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and ends the partial government shutdown that began after the existing CR expired on December 21, 2018, because seven of the remaining FY2019 appropriations bills have not been enacted. (Five of the FY2019 appropriations bills were enacted last year, including the Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2019; the Energy and Water Development and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019; the Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019; the Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 2019; and the Military Construction, Veterans Affairs, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019.) Additionally, the CR has the effect of extending through February 1, 2019, several authorities and programs that were extended in prior CRs, including the Violence Against Women Act, the authority for the Environmental Protection Agency to collect and spend certain fees related to pesticides, the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program, and several authorities related to immigration.
Title
Further Additional Continuing Appropriations Act, 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution RC# 31 (Y: 237 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 237 - 187 (Roll no. 31). |
2019-01-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H578-579) |
2019-01-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 27. |
2019-01-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H556-558; text: CR H556) |
2019-01-15 | House | Mrs. Lowey moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution. |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR28 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-5. (TXT | PDF)
HR52 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR45 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HR52 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR45 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Crimes against women
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Immigration status and procedures
Licensing and registrations
Pest management
Poverty and welfare assistance
User charges and fees
Violent crime
Crimes against women
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Immigration status and procedures
Licensing and registrations
Pest management
Poverty and welfare assistance
User charges and fees
Violent crime