US HJR42 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution honors the contributions of school counselors to the success of students in elementary and secondary schools. The resolution encourages the observation of National School Counseling Week with ceremonies and activities that promote awareness of the crucial role school counselors play in preparing students for fulfilling lives as contributing members of society.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of February 4, 2019, through February 8, 2019, as "National School Counseling Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR38 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811-812)
SR477 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S280)
HJR84 (Related) 2020-02-03 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E120)
SR477 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S280)
HJR84 (Related) 2020-02-03 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E120)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-joint-resolution/42/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hjres42/BILLS-116hjres42ih.pdf |