US HJR44 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-19 - Became Public Law No: 111-61.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes the service, sacrifice, honor, and professionalism of the noncommissioned officers of the U.S. Army. Expresses the deepest appreciation to such officers who serve or have served in defense of the United States. Encourages the people of the United States to recognize, commemorate, and honor the role and contribution of noncommissioned officers, past and present, in defense of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the service, sacrifice, honor, and professionalism of the Noncommissioned Officers of the United States Army.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-19 Became Public Law No: 111-61.
2009-08-19 Signed by President.
2009-08-11 Presented to President.
2009-08-05 Message on Senate action sent to the House.
2009-08-04 Cleared for White House.
2009-08-04 Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8778)
2009-08-04 Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2009-07-29 Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
2009-07-28 Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2009-07-28 On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/27/2009 H8836-8837)
2009-07-28 Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8935-8936)
2009-07-27 At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Wilson (SC) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
2009-07-27 DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 44.
2009-07-27 Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8836-8839)
2009-07-27 Mr. Marshall moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
2009-05-22 Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2009-04-29 Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback