US HJR44 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-12. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-12. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of the Interior relating to Bureau of Land Management regulations that establish the procedures used to prepare, revise, or amend land use plans pursuant to the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976. This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Department of the Interior on December 12, 2016, relating to revising regulations that establish the procedures used to prepare, revise, or amend land use plans pursuant to the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976.
Title
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of the Interior relating to Bureau of Land Management regulations that establish the procedures used to prepare, revise, or amend land use plans pursuant to the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 82 (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - On passage RC# 83 (Y: 234 N: 186 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - On passage RC# 83 (Y: 234 N: 186 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-12. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 82. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1609-1625) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (CR S1601) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-02-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-07 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 186 (Roll no. 83). (text: CR H1032) |
2017-02-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1055-1056) |
2017-02-07 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 44, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Grijalva demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced. |
2017-02-07 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-02-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 44. |
2017-02-07 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.J. Res. 57 and H.J. Res. 58. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each joint resolution. Each joint resolution is closed to amendments and allowed one motion to recommit. |
2017-02-07 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 91. (consideration: CR H1032-1041) |
2017-02-06 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 91 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.J. Res. 57 and H.J. Res. 58. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each joint resolution. Each joint resolution is closed to amendments and allowed one motion to recommit. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR91 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources