US HJR50 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution requiring that each agency and department's funding is justified. This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting total outlays for a fiscal year from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year unless (1) Congress authorizes the excess by a three-fifths vote of each chamber, and (2) total outlays do not exceed a specified percentage of the estimated gross domestic product of the United States. The prohibition excludes outlays for repayment of debt principal and receipts derived from borrowing. The amendment requires a three-fifths vote of each chamber of Congress to increase revenue or increase the limit on the debt of the United States. The President must submit an annual budget in which total outlays do not exceed total receipts and that includes justifications and specified details regarding funding proposed for departments and agencies. Congress may waive the requirements due to a declaration of war, a military conflict, an event that causes an imminent and serious military threat to national security, or a natural disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution requiring that each agency and department's funding is justified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-03-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HJR6 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR22 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback