US HJR55 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-04-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HJR6 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR11 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR22 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR18 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback