US HJR60 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-28. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-28. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution requests the Department of the Interior to authorize the unique display of National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) and Smithsonian artifacts, digital content, film footage, and associated historic audio and imagery in the vicinity of the National Mall, including projections onto the surface of the Washington Monument for five nights of public display beginning on July 16, 2019.
Title
Requesting the Secretary of the Interior to authorize unique and one-time arrangements for displays on the National Mall and the Washington Monument during the period beginning on July 16, 2019 and ending on July 20, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-28. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-07-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-06-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3804) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-06-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-10 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4378) |
2019-06-10 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4377-4378) |
2019-06-10 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2019-06-10 | House | Mr. Soto asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR405 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Digital media
District of Columbia
Historical and cultural resources
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Science, technology, communications
Smithsonian Institution
Space flight and exploration
U.S. history
Digital media
District of Columbia
Historical and cultural resources
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Science, technology, communications
Smithsonian Institution
Space flight and exploration
U.S. history