US HJR77 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-25)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses Congress's opposition to the decision to end U.S. efforts to prevent Turkey's military operations against Kurdish forces in northeast Syria. It also calls on (1) Turkey to immediately cease unilateral military action in northeast Syria and respect existing agreements, (2) the United States to continue supporting Syrian Kurdish communities through military and humanitarian support and ensure that the Turkish military acts with restraint, and (3) the White House to present a clear and specific plan for the enduring defeat of the Islamic State of Iraq and Syria (ISIS).
Title
Opposing the decision to end certain United States efforts to prevent Turkish military operations against Syrian Kurdish forces in Northeast Syria.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution RC# 560 (Y: 354 N: 60 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246. |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-10-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 354 - 60, 4 Present (Roll no. 560). (text: CR H8157-8158) |
2019-10-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8164-8165) |
2019-10-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 77. |
2019-10-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8157-8163) |
2019-10-16 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-10-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR625 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR57 (Same As) 2019-10-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR57 (Same As) 2019-10-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Syria
Turkey
Conflicts and wars
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Syria
Turkey