US HJR82 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities against Iran unless explicitly authorized by a congressional declaration of war or a specific authorization for use of military force.
Title
Direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities against the Islamic Republic of Iran that have not been authorized by Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-01-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR63 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - S.Amdt.1281 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR68 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 44. Record Vote Number: 84.
SJR69 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR68 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 44. Record Vote Number: 84.
SJR69 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-joint-resolution/82/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hjres82/BILLS-116hjres82ih.pdf |