US HJR85 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution terminates the national emergency related to the U.S.-Mexico border, declared by the President on February 15, 2019.
Title
Relating to a national emergency declared by the President on February 15, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR46 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - The Chair announced that the bill and accompanying veto message were referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
HJR75 (Same As) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SJR10 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1600-1601)
SJR54 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 36. Record Vote Number: 325.
HJR75 (Same As) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SJR10 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1600-1601)
SJR54 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 36. Record Vote Number: 325.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-joint-resolution/85/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hjres85/BILLS-116hjres85ih.pdf |