US HJR88 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Became Public Law No: 116-163. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Became Public Law No: 116-163. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution appoints Franklin D. Raines as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.
Title
Providing for the appointment of Franklin D. Raines as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-163. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-02 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-09-22 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5560) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-08-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-08-22 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4300) |
2020-08-22 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4299-4300) |
2020-08-22 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2020-08-22 | House | Mr. Raskin asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR73 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Government operations and politics
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution