US HR1000 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of Women Veterans Appreciation Day to recognize the service and sacrifices of women veterans who have served valiantly on behalf of the United States.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of June 12, 2020, as "Women Veterans Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR438 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR235 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3804)
SR616 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/11/2020 CR S2937)
SR235 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3804)
SR616 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/11/2020 CR S2937)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Women's employment
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1000/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1000/BILLS-116hres1000ih.pdf |