US HR1012 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the alliance between the United States and South Korea. The resolution also commends the two countries' cooperation with respect to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic.
Title
Recognizing the 70th anniversary of the outbreak of the Korean war and the transformation of the United States-Korea alliance into a mutually beneficial, global partnership.
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5884-5885) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1012. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5884-5886) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation Discharged. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2020-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
South Korea
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
South Korea
Veterans' organizations and recognition