US HR1053 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 6395 (William M. [Mac] Thornberry National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021), H.B. 7027 (Child Care Is Essential Act), H.B. 7327 (Child Care for Economic Recovery Act), and the Senate amendments to H.B. 1957 (Great American Outdoors Act). In addition, this resolution further extends the following dates in H.Res. 967, as amended by H.Res. 1017, through: the legislative day of September 21, 2020, by which certain proceedings may take place in the House; the calendar day of September 20, 2020, the authority of the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules; and the legislative day of September 21, 2020, provisions waiving a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules through such legislative day, on the same day they are presented to the House.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6395) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2021 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7027) making additional supplemental appropriations for disaster relief requirements for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7327) making additional supplemental appropriations for disaster relief requirements for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the Senate amendments to the bill (H.B. 1957) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modernize and improve the Internal Revenue Service, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 140 (Y: 224 N: 166 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 139 (Y: 220 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 139 (Y: 220 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-20 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 166 (Roll no. 140). (text: CR H3100) |
2020-07-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3108-3109) |
2020-07-20 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution, and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Woodall demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the resolution until a time to be announced. |
2020-07-20 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 162 (Roll no. 139). (consideration: CR H3107) |
2020-07-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1053. |
2020-07-20 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H3100-3108) |
2020-07-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 84. |
2020-07-20 | House | Provides for the consideration of H.R. 6395, H.R. 7027, H.R. 7327, and the Senate Amendments to H.R. 1957. Rule also provides that H.Res. 967, as amended by H.Res. 1017, is further amended by inserting a new date. |
2020-07-20 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-457, by Mr. Perlmutter. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1957 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7027 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB7327 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HR967 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1017 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7027 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB7327 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HR967 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1017 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.