US HR106 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Denouncing female genital mutilation/cutting as a violation of the human rights of women and girls and urging the international community and the Federal Government to increase efforts to eliminate the harmful practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Denouncing female genital mutilation/cutting as a violation of the human rights of women and girls and urging the international community and the Federal Government to increase efforts to eliminate the harmful practice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution RC# 219 (Y: 393 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-20HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 0 (Roll no. 219). (text: CR H3976)
2019-05-20HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3996)
2019-05-20HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-05-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 106.
2019-05-20HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3976-3978)
2019-05-20HouseMr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-04-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback