US HR107 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-18)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution establishes in the House of Representatives the Congressional Gold Star Family Fellowship Program under which certain family members of deceased members of the Armed Forces or deceased veterans may serve a 12-month fellowship in the office of a Member of the House.
Title
SFC Sean Cooley and SPC Christopher Horton Congressional Gold Star Family Fellowship Program Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8580) |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8585) |
2019-10-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Davis, Rodney objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2019-10-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 107. |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8580-8583) |
2019-10-29 | House | Ms. Lofgren moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR82 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SR98 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR812 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR98 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR812 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Military personnel and dependents