US HR1082 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FAA Reauthorization Act of 2018 Concurs in the Senate amendment to H.B. 302 (Sports Medicine Licensure Clarity Act of 2017) with an amendment.
Title
FAA Reauthorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution RC# 407 (Y: 398 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 398 - 23 (Roll no. 407). (text: CR H8905-9034) |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9058) |
2018-09-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, a recorded vote was demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1082. |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8905-9040) |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HR1082 (Similar To) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3509 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF)
SB3511 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3512 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7045 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
HB6862 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR1082 (Similar To) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3509 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF)
SB3511 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3512 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7045 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
HB6862 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.