US HR1100 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the importance of the relationship between the United States and Mongolia, as well as the continued democratic development of Mongolia. The resolution also encourages expanded U.S. efforts to support Mongolia in certain areas, particularly with respect to economic development.
Title
Reaffirming the strategic partnership between the United States and Mongolia and observing the 30th anniversary of democracy in Mongolia.
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6862-6863) |
2020-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1100. |
2020-12-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6862-6864) |
2020-12-07 | House | Mr. Raskin moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR665 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4637-4638)
Subjects
Asia
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Mongolia
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tariffs
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Mongolia
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tariffs