US HR1102 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-0)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the duty of the Federal Government to implement an agenda to Transform, Heal, and Renew by Investing in a Vibrant Economy ("THRIVE").

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the duty of the Federal Government to implement an agenda to Transform, Heal, and Renew by Investing in a Vibrant Economy ("THRIVE").

Sponsors

Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2020-09-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2020-09-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2020-09-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2020-09-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
2020-09-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2020-09-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2020-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR693 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5612-5613)

Subjects

Aging
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Community life and organization
Economics and public finance
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental health
Federal-Indian relations
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Internet and video services
Labor standards
Labor-management relations
Land use and conservation
Manufacturing
Minority education
Minority employment
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Rural conditions and development
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Unemployment
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wetlands
Women's employment
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback