US HR1122 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on October 14, 2018, as National Wildlife Refuge Week. Expresses support for the designation of National Wildlife Refuge Week. Acknowledges the importance of national wildlife refuges for their recreational opportunities and contribution to local economies. Reaffirms the support of the House of Representatives for wildlife conservation and the National Wildlife Refuge System.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on October 14, 2018, as National Wildlife Refuge Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR560 (Related) 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SR289 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368-6389)
SR675 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821-6822)
SR289 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368-6389)
SR675 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821-6822)
Subjects
Birds
Commemorative events and holidays
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Commemorative events and holidays
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/1122/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres1122/BILLS-115hres1122ih.pdf |