US HR1124 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the month of October 2018 as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States. Expresses support for the celebration of Filipino American History Month as: (1) a testament to the advancement of Filipino Americans, and (2) a time to renew efforts toward the research and examination of history and culture so as to provide an opportunity for all people of the United States to learn more about Filipino Americans and to appreciate the historic contributions of Filipino Americans to the United States.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the month of October 2018 as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR571 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR305 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820; text as passed Senate: CR S6819)
SR678 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6823-6824)
SR305 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820; text as passed Senate: CR S6819)
SR678 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6823-6824)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/1124/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres1124/BILLS-115hres1124ih.pdf |