US HR1142 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Day and recognizes the need for additional research to find a cure.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 4, 2020, as "National Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Day", and raising awareness and understanding of polycystic kidney disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-09-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR696 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5616; text: CR S5615)
SR356 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/26/2019 CR S5757)
SR356 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/26/2019 CR S5757)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1142/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1142/BILLS-116hres1142ih.pdf |