US HR1157 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the achievements and goals of institutions of higher education that are designated as Asian American and Native American Pacific Islander-Serving Institutions on Asian American and Native American Pacific Islander-Serving Institutions Week and encourages eligible institutions to obtain the designation.
Title
Expressing support for the recognition of September 28, 2020, to October 2, 2020, as Asian American and Native American Pacific Islander-Serving Institutions Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR581 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Minority education
Native Americans
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Minority education
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1157/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1157/BILLS-116hres1157ih.pdf |