US HR1179 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Wildlife Refuge Week. The resolution acknowledges the importance of national wildlife refuges for their recreational opportunities and contribution to local economies. Finally, the resolution reaffirms the support of the House of Representatives for wildlife conservation and the National Wildlife Refuge System.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on October 11, 2020, as National Wildlife Refuge Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR628 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SR362 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/17/2019 CR S5901-5902)
SR362 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/17/2019 CR S5901-5902)
Subjects
Birds
Commemorative events and holidays
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Commemorative events and holidays
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1179/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1179/BILLS-116hres1179ih.pdf |