US HR1180 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 88) to modify the boundary of the Shiloh National Military Park located in Tennessee and Mississippi, to establish Parker's Crossroads Battlefield as an affiliated area of the National Park System, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from December 24, 2018, through January 3, 2019. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 88) to modify the boundary of the Shiloh National Military Park located in Tennessee and Mississippi, to establish Parker's Crossroads Battlefield as an affiliated area of the National Park System, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from December 24, 2018, through January 3, 2019.
Title
Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 88) to modify the boundary of the Shiloh National Military Park located in Tennessee and Mississippi, to establish Parker's Crossroads Battlefield as an affiliated area of the National Park System, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from December 24, 2018, through January 3, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 446 (Y: 207 N: 170 NV: 55 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 207 - 170 (Roll no. 446). (text: CR H10340-10341) |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10344-10345) |
2018-12-20 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 1180, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes prevailed. Mr. Sessions demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2018-12-20 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1180. |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H10340-10343) |
2018-12-19 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 197. |
2018-12-19 | House | Rule provides for consideration of the Senate amendment to H.R. 88, that the House agree to the Senate amendment with an amendment consisting of the text printed in Rules Committee Print 115-87. The rule also provides for proceedings during the period of December 24, 2018, through January 3, 2019. |
2018-12-19 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-1084, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB88 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
HR1160 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1160 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.