US HR1180 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) expresses support for the designation of National Family Service Learning Week, (2) recognizes the importance of family service learning in cultivating civic engagement and community investment, and (3) encourages the public to support family service learning and community development programs. Family service learning is a multigenerational problem-solving approach that utilizes active participation to meet community needs and develop the skillsets of children and families.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 21 through September 25, 2020, as "National Family Service Learning Week".
Sponsors
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR669 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR412 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6485; text: CR S6480-6481)
SR739 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5986)
SR412 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6485; text: CR S6480-6481)
SR739 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5986)
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Families
Family relationships
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Families
Family relationships
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1180/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1180/BILLS-116hres1180ih.pdf |