US HR119 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-20)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of Career and Technical Education Month to celebrate career and technical education across the United States.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of Career and Technical Education Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-02-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1506) |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR79 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1496; text: CR S1493)
HR864 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR515 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1230-1231)
HR864 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR515 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1230-1231)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/119/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres119/BILLS-116hres119ih.pdf |