US HR1228 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes National Native American Heritage Month and Native American Heritage Day.
Title
Recognizing National Native American Heritage Month and celebrating the cultures and contributions of Native Americans to the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-11-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR779 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083; text: CR S7080)
HR682 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR414 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6485-6486; text: CR S6481-6482)
HR682 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR414 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6485-6486; text: CR S6481-6482)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1228/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1228/BILLS-116hres1228ih.pdf |