US HR123 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 43) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule submitted by Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to compliance with title X requirements by project recipients in selecting subrecipients; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 69) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska"; and providing for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 43) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule submitted by Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to compliance with title X requirements by project recipients in selecting subrecipients; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 69) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska"; and providing for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017.
Title
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 43) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule submitted by Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to compliance with title X requirements by project recipients in selecting subrecipients; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 69) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska"; and providing for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 93 (Y: 233 N: 190 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 94 (Y: 233 N: 188 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Joint Resolution H.J.Res. 69 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 94 (Y: 233 N: 188 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Joint Resolution H.J.Res. 69 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-15 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 188 (Roll no. 94). (text: CR H1193) |
2017-02-15 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 190 (Roll no. 93). (consideration: CR H1199) |
2017-02-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 123. |
2017-02-15 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1193-1200) |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 12. |
2017-02-14 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017. |
2017-02-14 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-12, by Mr. Burgess. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR43 (Related) 2017-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-23. (TXT | PDF)
HJR69 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)
HJR69 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)